judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LESTER E. CASE v. OUTBACK PIPE HAULERS

Case Heading (06-206)
Case Number:06-206Case Docketed On:09/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:LESTER E. CASE v. OUTBACK PIPE HAULERS
Full Title:LESTER E. CASE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. OUTBACK PIPE HAULERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLester E. CaseNicholas H. Carter
Jeremy D. Michaels
AppelleeOutback Pipe HaulersJohn Anthony Coppede
Richard D. Bush

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 181
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/23/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/24/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/03/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk on 11/06/06BriefAppellantFinal
12/15/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/20/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
01/11/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volumes II through IV, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/26/2007Event - Phone Call - counsel for appellant indicated that case will settle.EventPhone CallFinal
04/19/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellant regarding possible settlement of case. Secretary will have him return call.EventPhone CallFinal
04/23/2007Event - Phone Call - Mr. Carter indicated that the case will not settle.EventPhone CallFinal
11/14/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/03/07 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal