Case Information: 33116 | |||
Short Caption: | STARK (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 27617 , 34969 , 36890 , 37486 , 44917 , 46833 , 51574 , 63596 , 67579 , 67579-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109793 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/22/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/07/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/07/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
10/08/1998 | Other | Other. Filed Certified Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on October 2, 1998. | ||
10/22/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall, within 120 days from the date of this order, transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court prodeedings. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | ||
11/12/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. On September 29, 1998, appellant filed a notice of appeal which was docketed in this court as Docket No. 33116. Appellant filed a second notice of appeal and the clerk of this court inadvertently docketed the second appeal as a separate matter in Docket No. 33205. We direct the clerk to administratively close Docket No. 33205 and transfer to Docket No. 33116, all documents filed or received in Docket No. 33205. Appellant's appeal from the denial of his habeas corpus petition will proceed in Docket No. 33116. We vacate the portion of our October 22, 1998, order directing the district court clerk to transmit a copy of the order to this court. The clerk of the district court shall comply with the portion of our October 22, 1998 order directing the clerk to transmit a copy of the complete trial court record within 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33116, 33205.] | ||
11/12/1998 | Other | Other. Transferred from Docket No. 33205 to Docket 33116: 10/21/98 Filing fee waived: Criminal. 10/21/98 Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
02/22/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 22 (copies). Mailed on: 2/19/99. | ||
02/22/1999 | Other | Other. Case Submitted on the Record on Appeal this day. | ||
02/22/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/13/1999 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal and Request for Suspension of Briefing Schedule Pending Resolution of This Motion. (Original and 1 copy.) | ||
10/10/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-17926 | |
11/07/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-17967 | |
11/07/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/21/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On October 10, 2000, this court dismissed appellant's proper person appeal. We deny as moot appellant's December 13, 1999, "motion for the appointment of counsel on appeal and request for suspension of briefing schedule pending resolutionof this motion." | 00-20417 | |
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 2000. | 00-17967 |