judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4934
A-4934
10/25/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF DALLAS, STATE OF TEXAS, CITY OF DALLAS, ET AL.
GUS T. FLENER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/17/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/12/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/30/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
10/25/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/07/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/17/1954Brief in Support of Petition
11/12/1954Brief in Support of Petition
10/30/1954Response to Petition
10/25/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/25/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF DALLAS, ET AL.Petitioner
City of DallasPetitioner
Gus T. FlenerRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information