Case: A-4890
A-4890
08/24/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF AUSTIN, ET AL., ROBERT J. MCKOWN, OBERT B. MCKOWN, AUSTIN B. MCKOWN AND ARTHUR L. MCKOWN, DEAN SKINNER
CURTIS O. SCHMEDES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/19/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/28/1955 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
03/11/1955 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
02/01/1955 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
01/28/1955 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
01/24/1955 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/20/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
09/25/1954 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
09/04/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/25/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
08/24/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
08/24/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/19/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/04/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/28/1955 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
03/11/1955 | Letter brief | | ||
02/01/1955 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
01/28/1955 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
01/24/1955 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
09/25/1954 | Reply to Response | | ||
09/04/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/25/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/24/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/24/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/24/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Looney, Clark and Moorhead | Amicus Curiae | |
CITY OF AUSTIN, ET AL. | Petitioner | |
Curtis O. Schmedes, et al. | Respondent | |
Dean Skinner | Petitioner | |
Robert J. McKown, Obert B. McKown, Austin B. McKown and Arthur L. McKown | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information