Case Information: 39285 | |||
Short Caption: | PANOYAN VS. EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A433467 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/12/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/05/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from The Law Offices of Craig P. Kenny & Associates--check no. 14863. | ||
03/05/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-03966 | |
03/07/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Due Date: 10 days. Kevin L. Johnson. | ||
03/14/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-04642 | |
03/14/2002 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Kevin L. Johnson of Beckett & Yott. Beckett & Yott does not represent Camelback Insulation. | 02-04661 | |
04/30/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. On March 5, 2002, a notice of settlement conference was issued assigning this appeal to the settlement program. Because it appears that respondent Camelback Insulation is proceeding in proper person, we vacate the notice of settlement conference. fn1[The clerk of this court shall modify the docket in this matter to reflect that respondent Camelback Insulation is proceeding in proper person.] Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Because respondent Camelback Insulation is proceeding proper person, Camelback Insulation will not be permitted to file documents in this appeal. If Camelback Insulation wishes to file documents in this appeal, it must retain counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. In the event Camelback Insulation retains counsel, this appeal will be assigned to the settlement program. | 02-07586 | |
05/13/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-08402 | |
09/03/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 08/30/02 | 02-15172 | |
09/03/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 02-15173 | |
09/25/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 09/25/02. | 02-16604 | |
10/21/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 10/19/02. | 02-18250 | |
05/12/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 03-08021 | |
05/12/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB) | ||
07/09/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB. | 03-11543 | |
08/05/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-11756 | |
08/05/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/14/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 7, 2003. | 03-11756 |