Case: 02-98-00067-CV
02-98-00067-CV
03/06/1998
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Conley-Lott Nichols Machinery, Co.
Mooneyham, Jerry Wayne
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/21/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/21/1999 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/17/1999 | Motion Filed | | |
04/08/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/07/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/07/1999 | Submission | | |
11/04/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
11/04/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/12/1998 | Amended Brief Filed | | |
10/12/1998 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/06/1998 | Motion Filed | | |
09/08/1998 | Letter | | |
08/31/1998 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
08/13/1998 | Letter | | |
08/11/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
06/29/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/29/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
05/21/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/19/1998 | Letter | | |
05/13/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
05/12/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
04/29/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
04/13/1998 | Exhibits Filed | | |
04/13/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
04/06/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
03/06/1998 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |
03/06/1998 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
03/06/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/21/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
360th District Court, Court Reporter, | Court Reporter | Court Reporter |
Conley-lott Nichols Machinery | Appellant | Lindsay Brown |
Mooneyham, Jerry Wayne | Appellee | Philip D. Phillips |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. Brent Keis
97-73551-1