Case Information: 32984 | |||
Short Caption: | MCINTYRE (JERRY) VS. STATE C/W 31004, 31363 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 31004 *, 31363 , 32984 | Related Case(s): | 31004 , 31363 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C96071 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/27/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/11/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
09/11/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
09/16/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32914, 32917, 32927, 32931, 32967, 32984, 32986. | ||
01/27/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 5 (copies). Mailed on: 1/25/99. | ||
01/27/1999 | Other | Other. Case Submitted on the Record on Appeal this day. | ||
01/27/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/14/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] Nos. 31004, 31363, 32984. Document No. 00-16249. | ||
09/21/2000 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Motion for Rehearing En Banc. (Nos. 31004, 31363 and 32984). | ||
10/10/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-16503 | |
10/10/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/31/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 31004, 31363, 32984. Document No. 00-19161. | ||
11/29/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. | 00-16503 |