Case: WR-49,335-02
WR-49,335-02
09/01/2002
1107-HC
MOORE, JOE WELTON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/17/2003 | ACTION TAKEN | Dismissed | |
06/11/2003 | SUPP RECD | | |
04/01/2003 | EXTENSION/SUPP | Granted | |
04/01/2003 | EXTENSION/SUPP | Granted | |
01/29/2003 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits | |
01/29/2003 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits | |
01/10/2003 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
11/21/2002 | MISC DOCU RECD | | |
09/01/2002 | HC WRIT RECEIVED | | |
09/01/2002 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/17/2003 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Moore, Joe Welton | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-00-00003-CR
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
242nd District Court
Swisher
10185-01-05-W2