Case: B-2969
B-2969
09/29/1971
Application for Writ of Error
THOMAS H. FELDERHOFF, JR.
AUGUST FELDERHOFF, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/01/1971 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/18/1971 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
10/11/1971 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/29/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/28/1971 | Letter Filed | | ||
12/28/1971 | Letter Filed | | ||
12/08/1971 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/01/1971 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/18/1971 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/11/1971 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/08/1971 | Letter Filed | | ||
09/29/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
09/29/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Thomas H. Felderhoff, Jr. | Petitioner | |
August Felderhoff, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information