Case: B-2956
B-2956
09/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES H. BUTLER
L. H. (BUD) HANSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/15/1971 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/14/1971 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/14/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/15/1971 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/01/1971 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/01/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/14/1971 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/23/1971 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
09/14/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
09/14/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James H. Butler | Petitioner | |
L. H. (Bud) Hanson | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information