Case Information: 35634 | |||
Short Caption: | KIMSEY VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35931 , 35933 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A408488 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/11/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/11/2000 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (via fax). | 00-02237 | |
02/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Petition for Writ of Prohibition (via fax). | 00-02239 | |
02/14/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. This petition for a writ of prohibiton challenges the reassignment of the underlying action from District Judge Mark R. Denton to Senior Judge Norman C. Robison. " . . . we deny the petition." FN1[On January 26, 2000, this court enter an order, nunc pro tunc, assigning Senior Judge Norman C. robison to sit in the eighth Judicial District Court from january 1, 2000, through June 30, 2000.] fn2[We deny, as moot, petitioner's emergency motion for a stay.] NNP99B-RR/CY/MS | 00-02282 | |
02/16/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lillian J. Sondgeroth--check no. 21603. | ||
02/16/2000 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Prohibition. ORIGINAL (filed via fax on 2/11/00). | 00-02447 | |
02/16/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. ORIGINAL Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (Filed via fax on 2/11/00) | 00-02449 | |
03/13/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-03902 | |
03/13/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |