judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD G. AUSTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0710
Short Caption:HAROLD G. AUSTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2986-80Filed Date:05/20/1981

Opening Event Date:05/20/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/29/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/26/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/13/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold G. Austin N
Mindy A. DanielsNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/20/1981NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/1982RECORD COMPLETED
07/26/1982BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/13/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/13/1982ARGUED BEFORE JUDGES KERN, PRYOR & DOYLE
11/03/1982AFFIRMED
09/06/1995APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION - to recall the mandate
09/15/1995TMC - Aplt's motion to recall the mandate
09/25/1995APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to motion to recall the mandate together with opposition to aplt's brief see: (93 co 996 and 94 co 1419)
10/11/1995RECEIVED - aple's opposition to aplt's motion to recall mandate
01/16/1996APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF filed in 93 co 996 and 94 co 1419
01/16/1996RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief filed in 93co996 and 94 co1419
01/16/1996RECEIVED - reply to government's opposition to recall the mandate