judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOBB (CLIFTON) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 32288
Short Caption:BOBB (CLIFTON) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR3981Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/05/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Within 120 day from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts. 1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
09/17/1998Other Other. Received proper person Request for Leave to Appear in Proper Persona and to File Proper Person Opening Brief (Received the original and 5 copies - 1 returned to appellant).
09/28/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
10/27/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This is a proper person appeal. On September 17, 1998, appellant submitted a proper person opening brief, a request for leave to appeal in proper person, and a request to file the opening brief. On September 28, 1998, respondent filed a motion to extend the time t file the answering brief. We have not granted appellant permission to file proper person documents and therefore, his opening brief was received by this court, and not filed. Thus, respondent is not required to file an answering brief. We deny respondent's motion to extend the time to file an answering brief. If respondent still seeks to respond to appellant' proper person opening brief after the record on appeal is filed, respondent may request to file an answering brief at that time.
11/09/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6.
11/09/1998Other Other. Case Submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
11/09/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We have reviewed the record on appeal and for the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that district court properly denied appellant's petition. Briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19680
12/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19697
12/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 12, 2000. 00-19697