judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRACY HALL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-230)
Case Number:06-230Case Docketed On:10/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:TRACY HALL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TRACY HALL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTracy HallD. Terry Rogers
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 138
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Various correspondence from Public Defender's Office and a court reporter in Natrona County regarding delay in preparation of transcripts dated from January 2006 through October 2006.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court. Delay caused by failure of court reports to timely complete and file transcripts. Counsel for appellant asked case be docketed without 05/06/99 motion hearing.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/07/2006Brief - Appellant and received copy on disk; received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/17/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/06/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/06/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Melissa M. SwearingenMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/07/2007Order - Grant - motion to withdraw - Melissa SwearingenOrderGrantFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
03/02/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, ten volumes: Volumes I through VII, original papers; Volume VIII, transcripts; Volume IX, confidential documents; Volume X, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Terry L. Armitage on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/21/2007Correspondence - Incoming - leter from appellant regarding bias - no relief requested and no action taken.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
03/22/2007Correspondence - Incoming - leter from appellant regading correspondence of 3/6/07 and responded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/10/2007Order - Oral argument - amending schedule - moved from 4/26/07 to 4/25/07 on court's own motion.OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Post-Conviction Counsel, PDP for appellant; Terry L. Armitage, Deputy Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/28/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/13/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/13/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/17/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal