judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2954
B-2954
09/10/1971
Application for Writ of Error
W. O. MANNING, ET AL.
VINCENT M. WEISNER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/03/1971Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/02/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/12/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
09/16/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/29/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/15/1971Opinion issued
12/03/1971Reply to Response
12/02/1971Response to Brief filed
11/12/1971Post submission brief filed
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
09/16/1971Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
09/16/1971Response to Petition
09/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vincent M. WeisnerRespondent
W. O. Manning, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information