Case Information: 32683 | |||
Short Caption: | PENA (YURI) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130648 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/25/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/13/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/13/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-02245 | |
09/16/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32542, 32649, 32683, 32688, 32726, 32739, 32751, 32759. | ||
01/25/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2 (copies). Mailed on: 1/21/99. | ||
01/25/1999 | Other | Other. Case submitted on the Record on Appeal this day. | ||
01/25/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/04/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." SNP00A-RR/CY/NB | 00-21129 | |
01/03/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-21237 | |
01/03/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/20/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. | 00-21237 |