judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2955
B-2955
09/14/1971
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
OSCAR H. MAUZY
LEGISLATIVE REDISTRICTING BOARD, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/24/1971Supplemental Brief filedIntervenor
09/23/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/22/1971Response to Petition
09/22/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedIntervenor
09/22/1971Response to PetitionIntervenor
09/22/1971Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/22/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/22/1971Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
09/21/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/14/1971Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/27/1971Opinion issued
09/24/1971Supplemental Brief filed
09/23/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/22/1971Response to Petition
09/22/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/22/1971Response to Petition
09/22/1971Brief on the Merits
09/22/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/22/1971Brief in Support of Petition
09/21/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/17/1971Miscellaneous Motion
09/14/1971Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
09/14/1971Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred HeadIntervenor
Legislative Redistricting Board, et al.Respondent
Texas AFL-CIOAmicus Curiae
George Bock, Chairman, Democratic Committee for Responsible GovermentAmicus Curiae
Oscar H. MauzyRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information