judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SYNANON FOUNDATION INC. BERNSTEIN, STUART A.

Case Information: 83-CV-1372
Short Caption:SYNANON FOUNDATION INC. BERNSTEIN, STUART A.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA7189-78Filed Date:11/10/1983

Opening Event Date:11/10/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/02/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/1984
Argued/Submitted:02/06/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Geoffrey P. Gitner YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
William F. Krebs NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Sherman L. Cohn YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Cope YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William D. Sullivan YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SYNANON FOUNDATION INC. BERNSTEIN, STUART A. ET AL
01/01/1906 GITNERG WITHDRAWN (3/19/85) KREBSW WITHDRAWN (3/19/85)
11/10/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/02/1984FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1984FiledBriefing Completed
02/06/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/29/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition