Case Information: 35626 | |||
Short Caption: | DUFF VS. PECK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61534 , 61688 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9902906 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/15/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/11/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/11/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-02173 | |
03/08/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 00-03623 | |
03/15/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 00-04116 | |
03/15/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/31/2000 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Letter from attorney Alice Campos Mercado regarding briefing in this case. | 00-09171 | |
06/08/2000 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. Response to Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Per. 02/03/03 ORDER: RETURNED UNFILED. | 00-09684 | |
03/21/2002 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. Response to Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Per and to Motion to Expediate Appellant's Appeal. 02/03/03 ORDER: RETURNED UNFILED. | 02-05063 | |
04/10/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Respondent Peck shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve his response indicating why this court should affirm the district court's January 24, 2000 order. fn3[No extension of time to file the response shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.] | 02-06406 | |
05/13/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 02-08388 | |
05/30/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. In an April 10, 2002 order, we directed respondent Peck to file a response. On May 13, 2002, respondent Peck filed his response. On May 20, 2002, we received from appellant Duff a motion for leave to file a reply to Peck's response. We grant appellant Duff's request for leave to appear in proper person for the limited purpose of filing a reply to the response. Duff shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a double-spaced, typed reply not to exceed ten pages in length. fn3[We caution appellant Duff that matters unsupported by the record presently before this court should not be referred to in his reply, as such matters cannot be considered by this court.] | 02-09466 | |
06/14/2002 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. | 02-10356 | |
02/03/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "AFFIRMED the order of the district court." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), with the exception of the reply brief filed on June 14, 2002, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant and deny all relief requested therein.] | 03-01756 | |
02/03/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to attorney Alice Campos Mercado. Returned unfiled, the original "Response to Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Per received June 8, 2000, Response to Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Per and to Motion to Expedite Consideration received December 6, 2002 and Response to Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Per and to Motion to Expedite Appellant's Appeal received March 21, 2002." | ||
03/04/2003 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c). We grant petitioner's motion for leave to file the instant rehearing petition, see NRAP 46(b), and we direct the clerk of this court to file the petition and motion, provisionally received on February 21, 2003.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG | 03-03589 | |
03/04/2003 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Per to file Petition for Rehearing. | 03-02904 | |
03/04/2003 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. | 03-02905 | |
04/01/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. | 03-03634 | |
04/01/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/07/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 2003. | 03-03634 |