Case: 10-02-00214-CV
10-02-00214-CV
07/17/2002
Mandamus
In re Bradley E. Parsons
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/19/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
08/17/2012 | Letter to trial court clerk for return of record | | |
09/27/2002 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/05/2002 | Petition for Review filed in the Supreme Court | | |
08/07/2002 | Opinion issued | Dissenting Opinion | |
08/07/2002 | Opinion issued | Concurring Opinion | |
08/07/2002 | Case stored | | |
08/07/2002 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |
08/07/2002 | (NO ACK) Writ disposed. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/07/2002 | (NO ACK) Writ disposed. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/07/2002 | (NO ACK) Writ disposed. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/02/2002 | Submitted | | |
07/30/2002 | Response to motion | | |
07/18/2002 | Order entered | | |
07/18/2002 | Submission | | |
07/17/2002 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/19/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State of | Criminal - State of Texas | Bill Moore Jason D. Tomlin Jim B. Simpson |
Harmon, Roger | Respondent | Judge Roger Harmon |
Parsons, Bradley E | Relator | Bradley E Parsons |
Texas Secretary of State | Interested Party | Gwyn Shea |
Trial Court Information
Honorable Roger O. Harmon