Case Information: 37264 | |||
Short Caption: | WESTERN UNION INS. CO. VS. LOMPREY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382256 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/16/2001 / Smith, Jay | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from V. Andrew Cass-check no. 023268. | ||
01/08/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 01-00381 | |
01/16/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/26/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter conditioned on payment, which should occur within 30 days. The parties shall submit a stipulation to dismiss appeal at the time settlement is concluded. | 01-05316 | |
05/30/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 01-08991 | |
06/27/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. | 01-10886 | |
07/20/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 01-12356 | |
07/20/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |