judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2980
B-2980
10/05/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT SNYDER AND MR. AND MRS. JOHN SNYDER, FIDELITY AND CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK, DAVID LYNN STEGALL, DARLA RHODES AND J. B. RHODES
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/14/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/01/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
10/06/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/05/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/15/1972Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/26/1972Opinion issued
07/14/1972Motion for Rehearing
06/28/1972Opinion issued
12/15/1971Document received (See Remarks)
12/15/1971Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1971Response to Petition
10/19/1971Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
10/06/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/05/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/05/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Insurance CompanyRespondent
David Lynn StegallPetitioner
Fidelity and Casualty Company of New YorkPetitioner
Robert Snyder and Mr. and Mrs. John SnyderPetitioner
Darla Rhodes and J. B. RhodesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information