judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DRESSER, DARRELL A. SUNDERLAND APARTMENTS TENANTS

Case Information: 82-CV-0252
Short Caption:DRESSER, DARRELL A. SUNDERLAND APARTMENTS TENANTSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5655-80Filed Date:02/10/1982

Opening Event Date:02/10/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/04/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/02/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DRESSER, DARRELL A. SUNDERLAND APARTMENTS TENANTS ASSOCIATION, INC., ET AL.
02/10/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/04/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/18/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/22/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition