Case Information: 37260 | |||
Short Caption: | SHIPLEY (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 38928 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C164227 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/08/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 01-00361 | |
01/29/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Clarification regarding Appointment of Counsel. | 01-01869 | |
02/05/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Motion re: clarification re appointment of counsel. | 01-02293 | |
02/05/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/2/00, 3/16/00, 12/20/00. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 01-02297 | |
02/12/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On January 29, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion for clarification regarding appointment of counsel. We construe counsel's motion as a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion to withdraw is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement within 40 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 01-02750 | |
03/23/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-05134 | |
03/23/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-05136 | |
03/26/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/30/00; 7/6/00; 9/7/00; and 11/16/00. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. | 01-05235 | |
04/05/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-05825 | |
04/30/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-07186 | |
05/29/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-07288 | |
05/29/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/21/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 31, 2001. | 01-07288 |