judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAPARRAL ENERGY, L.L.C. v. RMOC HOLDINGS, L.L.C. and SAMSON CONTOUR ENERGY; E&P, L.L.C.; and SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY

Case Heading (06-267)
Case Number:06-267Case Docketed On:11/29/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:CHAPARRAL ENERGY, L.L.C. v. RMOC HOLDINGS, L.L.C. and SAMSON CONTOUR ENERGY; E&P, L.L.C.; and SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY
Full Title:CHAPARRAL ENERGY, L.L.C., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. RMOC HOLDINGS, L.L.C., Appellee (Defendant), and SAMSON CONTOUR ENERGY; E&P,L.L.C.; and SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChaparral Energy, L.L.C.Richard Mathey
AppelleeRMOC Holdings, L.L.C.Robert J. Reese
AppelleeSamson Contour EnergyMistee Lyn Elliott
AppelleeE&P, L.L.C.Mistee Lyn Elliott
AppelleeSamson Resources CompanyMistee Lyn Elliott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/29/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/29/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/16/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/01/2007Brief - Appellee Samson Contour Energy, E&P, L.L.C. and Samson Resources CompanyBriefAppelleeFinal
03/06/2007Brief - Failure to file - appellee RMOC Holdings, L.L.C.BriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/19/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
03/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mr. Reese indicating that he is not attending oral argument. No brief was filed, no appearance allowed or necessary.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
04/25/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/25/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
04/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal