judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PARHAM (MERVYN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32284
Short Caption:PARHAM (MERVYN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133502Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. 00-09005
05/04/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certifited copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32252, 32271, 32273, 32275, 32284, 32305, 32312, 32315.
11/02/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
11/02/1998Other Other. Case submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
11/02/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the presentence investigation report.
06/05/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 2 (SEALED).
06/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Because the record before this court does not support the district court's ruling, the State shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be remanded to the district court for reconsideration of appellant's motion as a post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus and for the resolution of appellant's claims on the merits. 01-09905
07/17/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-12109
12/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. We conclude that oral argument and briefing are unwarranted in this matter. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED and REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn5[Although the record before this court does not show whether any good time credits have been applied to appellant's sentence, it appears that appellant might have expired his sentence if such credits were earned and applied. If so, we note for the benefit of the district court that the issue presented may have been rendered moot.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21266
01/15/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00562
01/15/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00562