Case Information: 32693 | |||
Short Caption: | COLEMAN (JOHN) VS. KURIAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A354556 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 09/24/1998 / Crockett, James | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/15/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert W. Lueck-check no. 10042. | ||
07/15/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 00-02247 | |
07/17/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Harlan Arnold. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
07/17/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
08/10/1998 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. | ||
08/10/1998 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. From attorney Robert Lueck regarding settlement conference and briefing schedule | ||
09/24/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr. (Settlement conference materials forwarded to Judge Crockett). | ||
11/09/1998 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | ||
12/01/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, appellant has not sought leave to file the late docketing statement. In the interest of judicial economy, we direct the clerk to file the docketing statement received on August 10, 1998, forthwith. Appellant shall, within 5 days from the date of this order, file the case appeal statement with the district court clerk's office. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file two certified copies of the case appeal statement with this court. | ||
12/01/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | ||
12/09/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on July 21, 1998. | ||
12/10/1998 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | ||
12/14/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In January, 1999, attorney Lueck assumed the office of District Judge in Clark County. The Honorable Robert W. Lueck, appellant's former counsel, shall within 20 days from the date of this order, inform this court in writing of the name of appellant's new counsel or shall inform this court of appellant's most recent mailing address. | ||
03/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We again direct that District Court Judge Lueck shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, inform this court in writing of the name of appellant's new counsel. In the event appellant is not represented by new counsel, District Judge Lueck shall inform this court of appellant's most recent mailing address. | 00-03355 | |
03/09/2000 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from District Judge Robert Lueck, responding to order filed 3/3/00. | 00-03739 | |
04/06/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 9, 2000, the Honorable Robert W. Lueck submitted a letter in response to our previous orders informing this court of appellant's most recent mailing address. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Appellant's new counsel shall have 15 days from the date the notice of appearance is filed to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to serve the opening brief and appendix. Should appellant no longer wish to pursue this appeal, appellant shall so inform this court within 30 days. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. | 00-05571 | |
06/02/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has failed to comply with our order of April 6, 2000, or to otherwise communicate with this court. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-09313 | |
06/28/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-11036 | |
06/28/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/15/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2000. | 00-11036 |