judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2952
B-2952
09/09/1971
Application for Writ of Error
TOMMY LEE DETRIXHE, CLARK M. CANN AND DUANE JENKINS
COUNTY BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF HEMPHILL COUNTY, JIM WATERFIELD, MRS. DICK DETRIXHE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/28/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/11/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/22/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
09/09/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1972Response to Motion filed
12/28/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/11/1971Reply to Response
09/22/1971Response to Petition
09/09/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/09/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
County Board of School Trustees of Hemphill County, Jim Waterfield, Mrs. Dick Detrixhe, et al.Respondent
Tommy Lee Detrixhe, Clark M. Cann and Duane JenkinsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information