Case Information: 83-CV-1328 | |||
Short Caption: | TUNG, HSUE W.T. CABE & COMPANY INC. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA3856-81 | Filed Date: | 10/27/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/27/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/11/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/31/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/29/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Hsue Tung | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N | |||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TUNG, HSUE W.T. CABE & COMPANY INC. ET AL | |||
10/27/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/11/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/31/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/29/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/16/1985 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |