Case Information: 35597 | |||
Short Caption: | SCOTT (ROGER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37130 , 38206 , 38240 , 40305 , 40439 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C132042 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01865 | |
03/23/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We note that a judgment of conviction has not yet been entered in district court case no. C132042.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-04635 | |
04/17/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 23, 2000, this court entered an order dismissing appellant's appeal. On February 25, 2000, this court received a proper person request for preparation of transcripts. On March 28, 2000, this court received a proper person opening brief. Although appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person, we have reviewed and considered these documents and conclude that appellant is not entitled to the relief requested. | 00-06080 | |
04/18/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-06169 | |
04/18/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/25/2000 | Other | Other. Returned, unfiled with letter, proper person letter dated April 19, 2000 regarding reasoning of order filed April 17, 2000. | ||
05/25/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 20, 2000. | 00-06169 |