judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-10101
A-10101
04/10/1964
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY
HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1966Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/24/1965Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/30/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/05/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/03/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/01/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/26/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/25/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/22/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/19/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/11/1965Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/02/1964Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/01/1964Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/19/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/11/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/11/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
04/10/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/07/1966Reply to Response
01/04/1966Response to Motion filed
12/27/1965Letter Filed
12/01/1965Miscellaneous letter
11/24/1965Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/10/1965Opinion issued
04/30/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/07/1965Document received (See Remarks)
04/07/1965Document received (See Remarks)
04/07/1965Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/05/1965Motion for leave to file brief
03/03/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/01/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/26/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/25/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/22/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/19/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/11/1965Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/02/1964Response to Brief filed
06/01/1964Reply to Response
05/19/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/11/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/11/1964Response to Petition
04/10/1964Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/10/1964Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kelley, Looney, McLean and LittletonAmicus Curiae
Houston Natural Gas CorporationAmicus Curiae
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANYPetitioner
Burford, Ryburn and FordAmicus Curiae
Baker, Botts, Shepherd and CoatesAmicus Curiae
Bennett L. SmithAmicus Curiae
Houston Independent School DistrictRespondent
SOUTHERN UNION GAS COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Texas Telephone AssociationAmicus Curiae
City Attorneys of the City of Dallas and City of Fort WorthAmicus Curiae
WEST TEXAS UTILITIES COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information