judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REJWAN VS. REBEL OIL COMPANY

Case Information: 35600
Short Caption:REJWAN VS. REBEL OIL COMPANYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33633
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A369721Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/11/2000 / Hale, FloydSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/09/2001 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/09/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/07/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Fitzgibbons & Anderson--check no. 47815.
02/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-01873
02/07/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
02/07/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 1/18/00 and Notice of Entry, if any. Due Date: 10 days
02/11/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Floyd A. Hale. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/03/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Mark Anderson enclosing a copy of (uncertified) case appeal statement filed in district court on 2/22/00, and stating that no judgment has been filed in this matter. 00-03365
03/23/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-04646
03/23/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
03/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 00-05180
04/10/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The settlement judge has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file with the Supreme Court Clerk's Office two certified copies of the case appeal statement. We caution appellant that failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the openidng brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). In preparing and assembling the appendix, counsel shall strickly comply with the provisions of NRAP 30. Fn1[…The court reporter to whom the transcript request form is directed shall have 30 days from the filing of the form to prepare and file with the supreme court a certified copy of the transcipts in accordance with NRAP 9(b)]. 00-05647
04/14/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-06007
04/19/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-06269
04/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: February 22, 2000. 00-06270
08/08/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex-8/7/00. 00-13733
08/08/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-13735
08/09/2000Notice/IncomingReceived Certificate of Compliance. To Opening Brief. Placed in back of brief.
09/15/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 11, 2000. 00-16310
10/10/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/07/00. 00-17883
10/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-17884
10/16/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. To Respondent's Answering Brief. 00-18337
11/13/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 11/9/00. 00-19770
11/15/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 00-20004
11/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing on Certificate of Compliance. 00-20381
02/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2001, at 9:30 a.m. (NNP01A-MS/RR/DA)
03/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP01A-MS/RR/DA
04/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Sandy Anderson of the Clark County Clerk's Office requesting a Certificate of Mailing of Motion to Strike Defendant's Answers, filed in the district court on March 10, 1999. 01-06135
04/09/2001Other Other. Filed fax copy Certificate of Service to Motion to Strike Defendants' Answers filed in the district court on March 10, 1999. 01-06136
04/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of Certificate of Service to Motion to Strike Defendants' Answers filed in the district court on March 10, 1999. 01-06542
07/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part; Reversing in Part; and Remanding. " . . . we reverse the district court's order granting default judgment, and remand this case to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-11887
08/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-12019
08/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-12019