judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-10116
A-10116
04/16/1964
MISC PETITION
W. L. AND R.H. PICKENS, PAUL C. TEAS, W. L. PICKENS, ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, HUNT OIL COMPANY, CITIES SERVIES OIL COMPANY, AMERADA PETOLEUM CORPORATION AND W. C. PERRYMAN, ET AL., W. C. PERRYMAN, ET AL., RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/24/1965Motion for Rehearing
01/18/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/13/1964Brief on the Merits
09/28/1964Response to Brief filed
08/24/1964Post submission brief filed
07/29/1964Supplemental Brief filedIntervenor
07/22/1964Response to Brief filed
07/22/1964Response to Brief filed
07/22/1964Response to Brief filed
07/06/1964Appellees' Brief filed
07/06/1964Appellees' Brief filed
06/08/1964Appellant's Brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/05/1965Motion to Argue filedOverruled
03/04/1965Response to Motion filed
03/03/1965Response to Motion filed
02/24/1965Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/10/1965Opinion issued
01/18/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/13/1964Brief on the Merits
09/28/1964Response to Brief filed
08/24/1964Post submission brief filed
07/29/1964Supplemental Brief filed
07/22/1964Response to Brief filed
07/22/1964Response to Brief filed
07/22/1964Response to Brief filed
07/06/1964Appellees' Brief filed
07/06/1964Appellees' Brief filed
06/08/1964Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
06/08/1964Appellant's Brief filed
06/08/1964Letter Filed
06/05/1964Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
04/29/1964Motion for Extension of Time filed
04/17/1964Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1964Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1964Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1964Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1964Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. F. Westbrook, et al.Intervenor
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellee
Hunt Oil Company, Cities Servies Oil Company, Amerada Petoleum Corporation and W. C. Perryman, et al.Appellee
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Appellee
W. C. Perryman, et al.Appellee
W. L. and R.H. PickensAppellant
Ira ButlerAmicus Curiae
W. L. Pickens, et al.Appellant
Paul C. TeasAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information