Case Information: 35599 | |||
Short Caption: | WASHBURN VS. SANCHEZ | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A407588 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2000 / Hale, Floyd | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen Nelson & Sanders--check no. 20662. | ||
02/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01870 | |
02/11/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Floyd A. Hale. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/29/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 24, 2000. | 00-05055 | |
05/03/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 8, 2000. | 00-07205 | |
05/15/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 00-08068 | |
05/15/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 00-08070 | |
05/25/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. fn1[The parties' stipulation to dismiss this appeal refers to a substitution of counsel for respondents and states that a copy of such document is attached to the stipulation. A copy of the substitution of counsel is not attached to the stipulation. Despite the procedural deficiency in effecting a substitution of counsel, the substitution of counsel is approved.] SNP/CLK | 00-08821 | |
05/25/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |