Case Information: 35616 | |||
Short Caption: | ATHAN VS. MCLEOD | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9705941 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/22/2000 / Shipman, Madelyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bamberg & Associates--check no. 5771. | ||
02/09/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-02094 | |
02/22/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/08/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 00-09665 | |
06/08/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
06/20/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 00-10512 | |
06/30/2000 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Daniel F. Bamberg requesting that this appeal be withdrawn due to bankruptcy proceedings. | 00-11202 | |
08/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On June 30, 2000, this court received a letter from Daniel L. Bamberg, counsel for appellant, informing this court that on June 21, 2000, Mr. Athan (and his wife, Cheryl) filed a Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Proceeding. We order this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Attorney Bamberg's letter additional requests that this appeal be "withdrawn." We deny appellant's motion to withdraw his appeal without prejudice to refile the motion after the bankruptcy stay is lifted or the bankruptcy proceeding has been finally resolved. | 00-13571 | |
10/10/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. To date, appellant's counsel has not complied with the August 7, 2000, order. Appellant's counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the requested status report or to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel. | 00-17867 | |
10/24/2000 | Other | Other. Status of Appellant, Athan's Bankruptcy Proceeding. | 00-18766 | |
10/31/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Status Report. Status report due from appellant: 60 days of the date of this order. | 00-19132 | |
01/02/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Status of Appellant's (Athan) Bankruptcy Proceeding Report. | 01-00080 | |
01/19/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On January 2, 2001, appellant filed a status report of appellant's bankruptcy proceeding. This court is uncertain what effect, if any, the "Discarge of Debtor" has on the instant appeal. The appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, what effect, if any, the bankruptcy court order has on this appeal. | 01-01228 | |
04/27/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order,inform this court, in writing, what effect, if any, the bankruptcy court order has on this appeal. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. | 01-07127 | |
05/30/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. The Effect that Debtor's "Discharge in Bankruptcy" has upon this Appeal. Mailed on: 5/23/01. | 01-09006 | |
02/20/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to order of this court, on May 30, 2001, appellant filed a notice informing this court concerning the effect of the 'Discharge of Debtor' on this appeal. Because the 'Discharge of Debtor' is a final disposition of the bankruptcy proceedings, we lift the bankruptcy stay. Further, because it appears that the judgment appealed from has been made 'void' as a result of the 'Discharge of Debtor', and appellant is enjoined from continuing this action, we ' . . . order this appeal dismissed.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-03193 | |
03/19/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-03258 | |
03/19/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/25/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2002. | 02-03258 |