judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT W. LEE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-116)
Case Number:06-116Case Docketed On:05/31/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:ROBERT W. LEE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT W. LEE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert W. Lee Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 81
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/31/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
05/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/13/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/24/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/24/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/01/2006Correspondence - Incoming from appellant regarding case status. Noted change of address.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/01/2006Correspondence - Outgoing response to case statusCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
10/09/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/15/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
11/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Correction by appellee for appellant; brief mailed to corrected addressNotice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
11/21/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Correction by appellee for appellant; designation of record mailed to corrected addressNotice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
12/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/07/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Prior Supreme Court RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/19/2007Order - Granting appellant to proceed in forma pauperis nunc pro tuncOrderGrantFinal
05/14/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order; dismissing for lack of jurisdiction. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court; Justice Hill filed a specially concurring opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/01/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal