judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAPIES, JAMES A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0465
Short Caption:CAPIES, JAMES A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5378-78Filed Date:04/02/1981

Opening Event Date:04/02/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/08/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/01/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/13/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CAPIES, JAMES A. AKA CHARLES LANCASTER UNITED STATES
04/02/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/08/1981FiledRecord Completed
11/01/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/13/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/09/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition