Case Information: 35617 | |||
Short Caption: | BLAISDELL (STEVEN) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P2258 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/09/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-02097 | |
02/16/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 12/16/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Karen Bryson. | 00-02473 | |
02/16/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 2/11/00. Karla K. Butko is appointed as attorney of record for the appeal. | 00-02474 | |
03/06/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-03527 | |
03/06/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 00-03528 | |
03/28/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-04951 | |
08/16/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On appeal, appellant contends that the district court abused its discretion at sentencing. This issue was not raised below. We therefore decline to consider it.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14317 | |
09/12/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14480 | |
09/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/20/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2000. | 00-14480 |