Case Information: 35602 | |||
Short Caption: | HAYS HOME DELIVERY VS. EICON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 9801219A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2000 / Hicks, Larry | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 06/14/2001 at 8:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 06/14/2001 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd.--check no. 006915. | ||
02/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01879 | |
02/08/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/25/99. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. | 00-02021 | |
02/11/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/25/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 00-06665 | |
04/25/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
05/03/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 00-07225 | |
05/10/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-07756 | |
05/16/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-08200 | |
08/30/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 29, 2000. | 00-15322 | |
08/31/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice to the Court from attorney Gerald Welt. He does not represent respondent in this appeal. | 00-15366 | |
09/19/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On August 31, 2000, Gerald M. Welt, Esq., filed a notice with this court stating that he is not representing respondent Everett Green in this appeal. We acknowledge that Mr. Welt is not counsel for respondent Green in this appeal. Respondent Green shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain counsel to represent him in this appeal and to cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. If respondent Green fails to obtain counsel, respondent Green will not be permitted to file any briefs in this appeal. | 00-16532 | |
09/26/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 00-17018 | |
09/28/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The September 26, 2000, motion is granted. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before October 20, 2000. | 00-17188 | |
10/20/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/20/00 (Reno/Carson). | 00-18679 | |
10/20/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. | 00-18680 | |
11/27/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/21/00. | 00-20650 | |
12/26/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 26, 2001. | 00-22472 | |
01/24/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On September 19, 2001, this court directed respondent Everett Green to obtain new counsel to represent him in this appeal. To date, Mr. Green has failed to obtain counsel and will not be permitted to file briefs in this appeal. This court will consider only those briefs filed by appellant and respondent, Employers Insurance Company of Nevada, when taking this matter under consideration. | 01-01534 | |
01/26/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 1/26/01. | 01-01809 | |
05/02/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 14, 2001 at 8:30 a.m. (En Banc) | ||
05/30/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
06/14/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC | ||
09/12/2001 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55. | 01-15380 | |
10/09/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-15666 | |
10/09/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/19/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 10, 2001. | 01-15666 |