Case: 05-99-00333-CR
05-99-00333-CR
02/23/1999
Possession of Cocaine
Holland, Gregory D.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/23/1999 | Brief Due | | |
04/15/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/15/1999 | Opinion issued | Withdrawn | |
04/15/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/15/1999 | Opinion issued | Withdrawn | |
04/14/1999 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
03/24/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
03/23/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
03/16/1999 | Record due | | |
03/01/1999 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
02/23/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/23/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/15/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/15/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/15/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Sue Korioth |
Gregory D. Holland | Criminal - Appellant | William R. Barr |
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable E. Paul Banner
F97-76995-UV
15 yrs/$500 fine