judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MGM GRAND HOTEL VS. DISTRICT COURT C/W 35533/35572

Case Information: 35601
Short Caption:MGM GRAND HOTEL VS. DISTRICT COURT C/W 35533/35572Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 35533 *, 35572 , 35601Related Case(s): 35533 , 35572 , 39180 , 39353
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A383711Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/07/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kravitz Schnitzer & Sloane, Chtd.--check no. 16382.
02/07/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Joinder in Previous Petitions Filed by Kish Rigging and Harris Production Services/ECTS, a Scenic Technology Company, Inc. 00-01874
02/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest: 20 days from the date of this order. 00-02264
02/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Harris Production Services and ETCS, a Scenic Technology Company, Inc.'s Joinder in MGM Grand Hotel & Casino and MGM Grand Inc.'s Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition pursuant to N.R.A.P. 28(I). 00-02332
02/14/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Harris Production Services and ETCS, a Scenic Technology Company, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate pursuant to NRCP 1 and NRCP 42(a). Nos. 35533, 35572, 35601.
02/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Joint Motion Re: Consolidation and Briefing Schedule (nos. 35601/35533/35572). 00-03129
02/28/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Foy Inventerprises, Inc.,'s Joinder in Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Prohibition. 00-03137
03/01/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for En Banc Hearing and Oral Argument. 00-03219
03/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Foy Enterprises, Inc.'s Joinder to the Motion for En Banc Hearing and Oral Argument. 00-03816
03/13/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Real Parties in Interest Michael Crawford and Entco Three's Opposition to Motion for "En Banc Hearing and Oral Argument". 00-03907
03/14/2000MotionFiled Motion. Harris Production Service and ECTS, a Scenic Technology Company, Inc.'s Joinder in MGM Grand Hotel & Casino, Inc.'s Motion for En Banc Hearing and Oral Argument. 00-04018
03/16/2000MotionFiled Motion. Kish Rigging, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply and as May be Needed, for Leave to Intervene. 00-04210
03/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. The parties have stipulated and jointly moved to consolidate these writ petitions. The motion is granted, and the petitions in docket Number 35533, 35572, and 35601 are hereby consolidated. The briefing schedule is approved. The real parties in interest shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file a joint answer. Petitioners shall then have 30 days from the date of the service of the answer to file a joint reply. fn1[Petitioners MGM Grand Hotel & Casino, Inc. and MGM Grand, Inc., have filed a motion for oral argument and en banc review in the first instance. This court will decide, in due course, whether this appeal will be considered by a panel or en banc and whether oral argument is warranted. The motion is therefore denied. In light of Foy Inventerprises' joinder in each of the three writ petitions, the clerk of the court is directed to modify the captions on this court's docket to reflect the captions set forth in this order.] Nos. 35533, 35572, 35601. 00-04517
04/14/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest Michael Crawford and Entco Three's Opposition to Petitoners' Request for Writ. Nos. 35533, 35572, 35601.
05/18/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner's Request for Extension of Time (File Reply - nos. 35533/35572/35601).
05/18/2000Petition/WritReceived Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners' Joint Reply to Real Parties in Interest Michael Crawford and Entco Three's Opposition to Petitioners' Request for a Writ. (nos. 35533/35572/35601).
05/22/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The petitioners' joint reply, submitted on May 18, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. Nos. 35533, 35572, 35601. Document No. 00-08362.
05/22/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners' Joint Reply to Real Parties in Interest Michael Crawford and Entco Three's Opposition to Petitioners' Request for Writ. Nos. 35533, 35572, 35601. Document No. 00-08362.
06/09/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petitions." fn1[Kish Rigging's motion filed March 16, 2000, to file a reply and for leave to intervene in docket No. 35601 is denied.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 35533/35572/35601. 01-05017
07/06/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (Nos. 35533, 35572 and 35601). 00-11410
07/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.