judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-10117
A-10117
04/16/1964
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
AMMEX WAREHOUSE COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS, TEXAS LIQUOR CONTROL BOARD AND COKE STEVENSON, JR., ADMINISTRATOR OF THE TEXAS LIQUOR CONTROL ACT., HARRY J. FELDMAN AND CHARLES B. FELDMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/25/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
05/21/1964Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1964Opinion issued
07/07/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/25/1964Response to Petition
05/25/1964Response to Motion filed
05/21/1964Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
05/21/1964Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
05/21/1964Order from Lower Court filed
05/21/1964Document received (See Remarks)
05/20/1964Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
05/20/1964Miscellaneous letter
05/20/1964Response to Motion filed
04/21/1964Letter Filed
04/16/1964Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harry J. Feldman and Charles B. FeldmanRespondent
State of Texas, Texas Liquor Control Board and Coke Stevenson, Jr., Administrator of the Texas Liquor Control Act.Respondent
Ammex Warehouse Company, Inc., et al.Relator
Clark, Thomas, Harris, Denius and WintersAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information