Case: PD-0483-01
PD-0483-01
03/22/2001
PDR Case Type
MARTINEZ, HECTOR LUIS, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/28/2001 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/30/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/30/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/01/2001 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/22/2001 | PDR FILED | | |
03/22/2001 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/17/2001 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Henry L. Garza |
MARTINEZ, HECTOR LUISJR. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Bob D. Odom |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-00-00581-CR
AFF 3-8-01
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
264th District Court
Bell
Honorable MARTHA J. TRUDO
49,977