Case Information: 39164 | |||
Short Caption: | RUIZ (MIKE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37984 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151740 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/26/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/07/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-02511 | |
03/11/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the Record on Appeal due: 120 days. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. | 02-04333 | |
04/08/2002 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion for Modification of Sentence filed in district court on April 2, 2002. | 02-06216 | |
06/26/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 02-10997 | |
06/26/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/06/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP03Y-WM/RR/DA | 02-19139 | |
12/03/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-19544 | |
12/03/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/23/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2002. | 02-19544 |