judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL BARRY JR., MARION S.

Case Information: 83-CV-1148
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL BARRY JR., MARION S.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:83-CV-1148Consolidated: 83-CV-1149
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA15942-82Filed Date:09/26/1983

Opening Event Date:09/26/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/05/1984
Argued/Submitted:05/23/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppelleeJohn Doe N
Paula W. Roberts NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Diane S. Millman YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
James C. Pyles YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard B. Nettler NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION ET AL BARRY JR., MARION S. ET AL
01/01/1906 PYLESJ PRO HAC VICE
09/26/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/07/1983FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1984FiledBriefing Completed
05/23/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/16/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition