judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAYNE, JOYCE L. SOFT SHEEN PRODUCTS INC.

Case Information: 83-CV-1218
Short Caption:PAYNE, JOYCE L. SOFT SHEEN PRODUCTS INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA16836-80Filed Date:10/12/1983

Opening Event Date:10/12/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/14/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/29/1984
Argued/Submitted:09/13/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Harris S. Ammerman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Brandon J. Levine NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William J. CarterYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PAYNE, JOYCE L. SOFT SHEEN PRODUCTS INC.
10/12/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/14/1984FiledRecord Completed
05/29/1984FiledBriefing Completed
09/13/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition