Case Information: 35603 | |||
Short Caption: | PIPKINS VS. FLORES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A413882 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01906 | |
02/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-02586 | |
03/15/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-04072 | |
03/15/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/27/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. | 00-04072 |