judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALPERN, ROBERT DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 82-CO-0082
Short Caption:ALPERN, ROBERT DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Lead: 82-CO-0080 Consolidated: 82-CM-0097 , 82-CM-0129 , 82-CO-0082
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:01/19/1982

Opening Event Date:01/19/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/14/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/29/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/22/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALPERN, ROBERT DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/19/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/14/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/29/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/22/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition