judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-10128
A-10128
04/20/1964
Application for Writ of Error
T. B. BURROW, ET AL.
JAMES W. MCMAHAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/18/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/09/1964Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/18/1964Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/04/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
04/20/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/23/1964Response to Motion filed
11/18/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/04/1964Opinion issued
06/09/1964Supplemental Brief filed
05/20/1964Document received (See Remarks)
05/20/1964Document received (See Remarks)
05/18/1964Reply to Response
05/04/1964Response to Petition
04/20/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/20/1964Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. B. Burrow, et al.Petitioner
James W. McMahan, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information