judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT H. BRADLEY v. DAYELLE FARGEY BRADLEY

Case Heading (06-201)
Case Number:06-201Case Docketed On:08/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ROBERT H. BRADLEY v. DAYELLE FARGEY BRADLEY
Full Title:ROBERT H. BRADLEY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAYELLE FARGEY BRADLEY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert H. BradleyKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeDayelle Fargey BradleyJessica Rutzick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 117
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/31/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/12/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/29/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/23/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
01/24/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/14/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kenneth S. Cohen for appellant; Jessica Rutzick for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/31/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/23/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/21/07 by Obrecht.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal